NC S19 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Ch. SL 2016-86
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Ch. SL 2016-86
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Uniform Recording Fees - Register of Deeds
Title
Uniform Recording Fees - Register of Deeds
Sponsors
Sen. William Rabon [R] | Sen. Robert Rucho [R] | Sen. Jerry Tillman [R] | Sen. Benjamin Clark [D] |
Sen. Joel Ford [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-24 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | Ch. SL 2016-86 | |
2016-06-30 | Signed by Gov. 6/30/2016 | |
2016-06-27 | Pres. To Gov. 06/27/2016 | |
2016-06-27 | Ratified | |
2016-06-24 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-06-24 | Senate | Concurred In H/Com Sub |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Reptd Fav To Concur |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/22/2016 |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2016-06-20 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2016-06-20 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-20 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-16 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/20/2016 |
2016-06-16 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-06-16 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-06-16 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2016-06-16 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2016-06-14 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2016-06-14 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-04 | House | Ref To Com On Finance |
2015-03-04 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-03 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 03/02/2015 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H41 (Same As) 2015-04-09 - Ch. SL 2015-6