NC S170 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - Re-ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Students, Parents, Community Rights Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Students, Parents, Community Rights Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-15 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-08HouseRe-ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-06-08HouseWithdrawn From Com
2021-03-17HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-03-17HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-03-16HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2021-03-16SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2021-03-15SenateEngrossed
2021-03-15SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2021-03-15SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2021-03-15SenateAmend Adopted A1
2021-03-11SenateReptd Fav
2021-03-10SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-03-10SenateReptd Fav
2021-03-03SenateRe-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-03-03SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-03-02SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-03-02SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-03-01SenateFiled

Subjects


North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback