NC S161 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-13 - Re-ref Com On Health
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-13 - Re-ref Com On Health
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Conforming Changes LME/MCO Grievances/Appeals
Title
Conforming Changes LME/MCO Grievances/Appeals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-13 | House | Re-ref Com On Health |
2017-06-13 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-13 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-04-13 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-11 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Filed |