NC S159 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - Ch. SL 2011-305
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - Ch. SL 2011-305
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Convey Blue Ridge Corr. Fac to Mayland CC
Title
Convey Blue Ridge Corr. Fac to Mayland CC
Sponsors
Sen. Ralph Hise [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-14 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-27 | Ch. SL 2011-305 | |
2011-06-27 | Became Law W/o Signature | |
2011-06-16 | Pres. To Gov. 6/16/2011 | |
2011-06-15 | Ratified | |
2011-06-14 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-14 | Placed On Cal For 6/14/2011 | |
2011-06-14 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-14 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-06-08 | Ref To Com On Education | |
2011-06-08 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-06-08 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-07 | Placed On Cal For 6/8/2011 | |
2011-06-07 | Recon 3rd & 2nd Readings | |
2011-06-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-07 | Placed On Cal For 6/7/2011 | |
2011-06-07 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-06-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-06-01 | Re-ref Com On Education/Higher Education | |
2011-06-01 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-03-02 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2011-03-02 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-01 | Filed |