NC S148 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-29 - Re-ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-29 - Re-ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Wastewater System Permit Extension
Title
Wastewater System Permit Extension
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2022-06-29 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-31 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-31 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-30 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Re-ref to Agriculture, Energy, and Environment. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Construction
Health Depts.
Health Services
Infrastructure
Licenses & Permits
Local Government
Public
Public Health
Utilities
Water & Sewer Systems
Health Depts.
Health Services
Infrastructure
Licenses & Permits
Local Government
Public
Public Health
Utilities
Water & Sewer Systems
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
130A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
130A | 336 | (n/a) | Citation Text |