NC S1444 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-10 - Ch. SL 2010-86
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-10 - Ch. SL 2010-86
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Kannapolis/Concord Doughnut Hole Annexations
Title
Kannapolis/Concord Doughnut Hole Annexations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-07-10 - Senate - House Amd. 1\Third Reading\Motion 8\To Concur (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-07-09 - Senate - House Amd. 1\Second Reading\Motion 8\To Concur (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-21 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-17 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-07-09 - Senate - House Amd. 1\Second Reading\Motion 8\To Concur (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-21 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-17 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-10 | Ch. SL 2010-86 | |
2010-07-10 | Ratified | |
2010-07-10 | Concurred In H Amend # 1 | |
2010-07-09 | Concurred In H Amend # 1 | |
2010-07-08 | Rec To Concur In H Amend | |
2010-07-08 | Rec From House | |
2010-07-08 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-07 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-07-06 | Amends Ruled Material | |
2010-07-06 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2010-07-06 | Reconsidered 2nd Reading | |
2010-07-06 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-07-01 | Placed On Cal For 7/6/2010 | |
2010-07-01 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-07-01 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-30 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2010-06-30 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-23 | Ref to the Com on Local Government II, if favorable, Finance | |
2010-06-23 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-06-21 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-17 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-16 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-06-16 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-27 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2010-05-26 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H2061 (Same As) 2010-05-27 - Ref to the Com on Local Government II, if favorable, Finance