NC S144 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-29 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-29 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Allow In-State Tuition/Athletic Scholarships
Title
Allow In-State Tuition/Athletic Scholarships
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-28 - House - A1 Richardson Second Reading (Y: 101 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-10-28 - House - Motion 12/ Appeal Ruling of Chair Second Reading (Y: 31 N: 76 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2019-10-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 88 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-10-28 - House - A2 Harrison Second Reading (Y: 36 N: 71 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-28 - House - Motion 12/ Appeal Ruling of Chair Second Reading (Y: 31 N: 76 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2019-10-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 88 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-10-28 - House - A2 Harrison Second Reading (Y: 36 N: 71 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-29 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2019-10-29 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-10-28 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2019-10-28 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-10-28 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-10-28 | House | Amend Failed A2 |
2019-10-28 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2019-10-24 | House | Placed On Cal For 10/28/2019 |
2019-10-24 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-10-23 | House | Placed On Cal For 10/24/2019 |
2019-10-23 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-10-23 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-10-23 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations, Education |
2019-10-23 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-07-17 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2019-07-17 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-07-16 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/17/2019 |
2019-07-16 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-07-15 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/16/2019 |
2019-07-15 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-07-15 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-07-15 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken |
2019-07-11 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2019-07-11 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-03-13 | House | Ref to the Com on Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-13 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-12 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Reptd Fav As Amended, Unengrossed |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H114 (Same As) 2019-10-17 - Sequential Referral To Rules and Operations of the Senate Stricken