NC H114 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Gross Premiums Tax/PHPs

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gross Premiums Tax/PHPs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - House - Third Reading (Y: 104 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11SenateRe-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-11SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-11SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-11SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-11SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-03-08HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-03-07HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-03-06HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-03-04HousePlaced On Cal For 03/06/2019
2019-03-04HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-03-04HouseReptd Fav
2019-02-27HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-27HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-02-21HouseRe-ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-21HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-02-21HouseRef to the Com on Insurance, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-21HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-19HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S144 (Same As) 2019-07-17 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback