NC S144 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-6)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - Ch. SL 2011-325
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-6)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - Ch. SL 2011-325
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Cash Converters Must Keep Purchase Records
Title
Cash Converters Must Keep Purchase Records
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-16 - Senate - Motion 9\To Concur (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - House - A1 McGuirt\Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - House - A1 McGuirt\Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-27 | Ch. SL 2011-325 | |
2011-06-27 | Signed By Gov. 6/27/2011 | |
2011-06-20 | Pres. To Gov. 6/20/2011 | |
2011-06-17 | Ratified | |
2011-06-16 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2011-06-16 | Placed On Cal For 6/16/2011 | |
2011-06-16 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2011-06-16 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-16 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2011-06-15 | Placed On Cal For 6/15/2011 | |
2011-06-15 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-15 | Serial Referral to Finance Stricken | |
2011-06-15 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-06-14 | Assigned To Commerce and Job Development Subcommittee on Business and Labor | |
2011-05-04 | Ref to the Com on Commerce and Job Development, if favorable, Finance | |
2011-05-04 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-05-02 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-28 | Placed On Cal For 5/2/2011 | |
2011-04-28 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-04-28 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2011-04-28 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-04-28 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-02-28 | Ref to Commerce. If fav, re-ref to Finance | |
2011-02-28 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-02-24 | Filed |