NC S140 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-22 - Ch. SL 2015-102
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-22 - Ch. SL 2015-102
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Lake Santeetlah Occupancy Tax Authorization
Title
Lake Santeetlah Occupancy Tax Authorization
Sponsors
Sen. James Davis [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - House - Third Reading (Y: 97 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - Second Reading (Y: 98 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - Second Reading (Y: 98 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-22 | Ch. SL 2015-102 | |
2015-06-22 | Ratified | |
2015-06-18 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-06-18 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-06-17 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-06-16 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/17/2015 |
2015-06-16 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-06-16 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-06-04 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2015-06-04 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-03-31 | House | Ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Finance |
2015-03-31 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-30 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Com Amend Adpt & Engross 1 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav As Amended |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H221 (Same As) 2015-03-12 - Ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Finance