NC S134 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-04 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-04 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Curb Underwriting Abuses
Title
Curb Underwriting Abuses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-30 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-04 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-04-04 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-04-03 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Administrative Code
Administrative Rules
Casualty
Commerce
Consumer Protection
Council Of State
Insurance
Insurance Commissioner
Insurance Dept.
Property
Public
Public Officials
Administrative Rules
Casualty
Commerce
Consumer Protection
Council Of State
Insurance
Insurance Commissioner
Insurance Dept.
Property
Public
Public Officials
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
150B | 19 | (n/a) | Citation Text |