NC S116 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Putting North Carolina Back to Work Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Putting North Carolina Back to Work Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-23 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 65 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 26 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-06-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 71 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-06SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-07-02 Vetoed 07/02/2021
2021-06-24 Pres. To Gov. 6/24/2021
2021-06-24 Ratified
2021-06-24SenateOrdered Enrolled
2021-06-23HouseConf Report Adopted
2021-06-23SenateConf Report Adopted
2021-06-23SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2021-06-23SenateConf Com Reported
2021-06-23HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-06-23HouseConf Com Reported
2021-06-15HouseConf Com Appointed
2021-06-14SenateConf Com Appointed
2021-06-14SenateFailed Concur In H Com Sub
2021-06-14SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2021-06-14SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-06-03SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-06-03SenateSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2021-06-03HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2021-06-03HouseOrdered Engrossed
2021-06-03HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-06-03HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-06-03HouseAmend Adopted A1
2021-06-02HousePlaced On Cal For 06/03/2021
2021-06-02HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-06-02HouseSerial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken
2021-06-02HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-06-01HouseRe-ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-06-01HouseWithdrawn From Com
2021-03-02HouseRef to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-03-02HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-03-02HouseSpecial Message Received From Senate
2021-03-02SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2021-03-01SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2021-03-01SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2021-02-25SenateReptd Fav
2021-02-24SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-02-24SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2021-02-24SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-02-22SenateRe-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-02-22SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-02-22SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-02-22SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-02-18SenateFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
9614.11(n/a)Citation Text
9614.9(n/a)Citation Text
9617(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/S116
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S116v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S116v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S116v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S116v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S116v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S116v5.pdf
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/645/0/S116-PCS45095-BE-2
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/51975/0/S116-PCS35289-TMf-16
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/51996/0/S116-ALU-11-V-1
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52267/0/S116-PCCS45441-TM-3
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52266/0/S116-PCCS-NBC-9025
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S116-SMBE-8(e1)-v-4
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S116-SMBE-9(e2)-v-5
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S116-SMTM-41(CSTMf-16)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S116-SMTM-42(e3)-v-1
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/29
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/375
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/272
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/306
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/416

Bill Comments 750

feedback