NC S1152 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-20 - Ch. SL 2010-115
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-20 - Ch. SL 2010-115
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Study Child Nutrition Program
Title
Study Child Nutrition Program
Sponsors
Sen. Charlie Dannelly [D] | Sen. Donald Davis [D] | Sen. Jean Preston [R] | Sen. William Purcell [D] |
Sen. Jerry Tillman [R] | Sen. Michael Walters [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-07-07 - Senate - Motion 8\To Concur (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-05-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-05-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-20 | Ch. SL 2010-115 | |
2010-07-20 | Signed By Gov. 7/20/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Pres. To Gov. 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Ratified | |
2010-07-07 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2010-07-06 | Placed On Cal For 7/7/2010 | |
2010-07-06 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2010-07-06 | Rec From House | |
2010-07-06 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-01 | Placed On Cal For 7/6/2010 | |
2010-07-01 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-07-01 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-06-29 | Re-ref Com On Health | |
2010-06-29 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-31 | Ref to the Com on Education, if favorable, Health | |
2010-05-31 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-27 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-05-26 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-17 | Ref To Com On Health Care | |
2010-05-13 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1777 (Same As) 2010-06-01 - Re-ref Com On Health