NC S1018 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-24 - Ch. SL 2009-163
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-24 - Ch. SL 2009-163
Summary
Ban Certain Single-Use Bags.
Title
Ban Certain Single-Use Bags.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-24 | Ch. SL 2009-163 | |
2009-06-24 | Signed By Gov. 6/24/2009 | |
2009-06-24 | Pres. To Gov. 6/23/2009 | |
2009-06-23 | Ratified | |
2009-06-22 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2009-06-22 | Placed On Cal For 6/22/2009 | |
2009-06-22 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2009-06-18 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-06-18 | Amend Failed 1 | |
2009-06-17 | Placed On Cal For 6/18/2009 | |
2009-06-17 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-06-17 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2009-06-09 | Re-ref Com On Commerce, Small Business, and Entrepreneurship | |
2009-06-09 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-18 | Ref to the Com on Environment and Natural Resources, if favorable, Commerce, Small Business, and Entrepreneurship | |
2009-05-18 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-05-13 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-12 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-05-12 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-04 | Re-ref Com On State and Local Government | |
2009-05-04 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-03-26 | Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources | |
2009-03-25 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H810 (Same As) 2011-06-06 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S1018 |