NC H990 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-08 - Adopted
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-08 - Adopted
Summary
Permanent House Rules.
Title
Permanent House Rules.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-08 | Adopted | |
2009-04-08 | Amend Failed 3 | |
2009-04-08 | Amend Failed 2 | |
2009-04-08 | Amend Failed 1 | |
2009-04-07 | Placed On Cal For 4/8/2009 | |
2009-04-07 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-04-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-02 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2009-04-02 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H990 |