NC H98 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-27 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-27 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Medical Freedom Act
Title
Medical Freedom Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 73 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-27 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2023-04-27 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2023-04-26 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-04-26 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-04-26 | House | Added to Calendar |
2023-04-26 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-04-26 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-03-29 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-03-29 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2023-03-21 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary 1 |
2023-03-21 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-02-14 | House | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Judiciary 1, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-02-14 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-02-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S121 (Same As) 2023-02-20 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Subjects
Disasters & Emergencies
Diseases & Health Disorders
Education
Government Employees
Health Services
Local Government
Local Government Employees
Personnel
Public
Public Health
Public Health Emergency
State Employees
Vaccines
Diseases & Health Disorders
Education
Government Employees
Health Services
Local Government
Local Government Employees
Personnel
Public
Public Health
Public Health Emergency
State Employees
Vaccines
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
130A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
130A | 152 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
130A | 158.3 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
143 | 162.6 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
153A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
153A | 461 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
160A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
160A | 499.6 | (n/a) | Citation Text |