NC H954 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-08-12 - Re-ref Com On Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs
Pending: House Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Qualified Disabled Veteran Preference

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Qualified Disabled Veteran Preference

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-12HouseRe-ref Com On Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs
2019-08-12HouseRemoved From Unfav Cal
2019-06-20HousePlaced on Unfav Cal
2019-06-20HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-06-13HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-13HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-06-12HouseRe-ref Com On Appropriations, General Government
2019-06-12HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-26HouseRef to the Com on Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs, if favorable, Appropriations, General Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-26HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-25HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback