NC H951 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-13 - Ch. SL 2021-165
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-13 - Ch. SL 2021-165
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Energy Solutions for North Carolina
Title
Energy Solutions for North Carolina
Sponsors
Rep. Dean Arp [R] | Rep. John Szoka [R] | Rep. Destin Hall [R] | Rep. John Bell [R] |
Rep. Dennis Riddell [R] | Rep. Harry Warren [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-10-07 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 90 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-10-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - House - A2 Arp Second Reading (Y: 61 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - House - Second Reading (Y: 57 N: 50 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-10-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - House - A2 Arp Second Reading (Y: 61 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - House - Second Reading (Y: 57 N: 50 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-13 | Ch. SL 2021-165 | |
2021-10-13 | Signed by Gov. 10/13/2021 | |
2021-10-07 | Pres. To Gov. 10/7/2021 | |
2021-10-07 | Ratified | |
2021-10-07 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-10-07 | House | Concurred In S Com Sub |
2021-10-06 | House | Placed On Cal For 10/07/2021 |
2021-10-06 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2021-10-06 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2021-10-06 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2021-10-06 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-10-06 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-10-06 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2021-10-06 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-10-05 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-10-05 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-10-05 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2021-10-05 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-10-05 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-08-02 | Senate | Re-ref to Agriculture, Energy, and Environment. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-08-02 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-07-19 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-07-19 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-07-19 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-07-16 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-07-15 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2021-07-15 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-07-14 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-07-14 | House | Amend Adopted A2 |
2021-07-14 | House | Amend Failed A1 |
2021-07-14 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-07-14 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-07-14 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-07-13 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-07-13 | House | Serial Referral To Appropriations Stricken |
2021-07-13 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-05-12 | House | Ref to the Com on Energy and Public Utilities, if favorable, Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-12 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-11 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Alternative Energy
Appropriations
Boards
Budgeting
Chaptered
Colleges & Universities
Commerce
Commissions
Deq
Education
Electricity Generation & Distribution
Environment
Hazardous Substances
Higher Education
Infrastructure
Policy Collaboratory
Pollution
Presented
Public
Radioactive Materials
Ratified
Reports
Studies
Title Change
Unc
Unc Board Of Governors
Utilities
Utilities Comn.
Appropriations
Boards
Budgeting
Chaptered
Colleges & Universities
Commerce
Commissions
Deq
Education
Electricity Generation & Distribution
Environment
Hazardous Substances
Higher Education
Infrastructure
Policy Collaboratory
Pollution
Presented
Public
Radioactive Materials
Ratified
Reports
Studies
Title Change
Unc
Unc Board Of Governors
Utilities
Utilities Comn.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 110.8 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
62 | 133.16 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
62 | 3 | (n/a) | Citation Text |