NC H93 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 36-21)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-29 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-29 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Req. Opioid Antagonist Ed. w/Opioid Scripts
Title
Req. Opioid Antagonist Ed. w/Opioid Scripts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-04-29 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-04-28 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-04-28 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-04-28 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-04-28 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-04-28 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-27 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-27 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2021-03-10 | House | Re-ref Com On Health |
2021-03-10 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-02-17 | House | Ref to the Com on Insurance, if favorable, Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-02-17 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Controlled Substances
Death & Dying
Dhhs
Fines & Penalties
Health Services
Hospices
Nurses & Nursing
Occupations
Pharmaceuticals
Pharmacists & Pharmacies
Physicians
Public
Public Health
State Employees
State Health Director
Death & Dying
Dhhs
Fines & Penalties
Health Services
Hospices
Nurses & Nursing
Occupations
Pharmaceuticals
Pharmacists & Pharmacies
Physicians
Public
Public Health
State Employees
State Health Director
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
90 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
90 | 12.8 | (n/a) | Citation Text |