NC H925 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-06 - Re-ref to the Com on Insurance, if favorable, Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-06 - Re-ref to the Com on Insurance, if favorable, Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Med Mal/Jury Instruction/Judicial Assignments
Title
Med Mal/Jury Instruction/Judicial Assignments
Sponsors
Rep. Destin Hall [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Insurance, if favorable, Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-06 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-05-06 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-05-06 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-05-03 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-03 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-04-22 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-22 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-16 | House | Filed |