NC H92 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-29 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-29 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
School Calendar Flexibility/Certain LEAs
Title
School Calendar Flexibility/Certain LEAs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-04-29 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-04-28 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-04-28 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-04-28 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-04-28 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-04-28 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-22 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-22 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-13 | House | Re-ref Com On Local Government |
2021-04-13 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-02-17 | House | Ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-02-17 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Boards
Calendar
Counties
Davidson County
Davie County
Education
Education Boards
Elementary Education
Iredell County
Kindergarten
Lexington
Local
Local Government
Mooresville
Municipalities
Secondary Education
Statesville
Thomasville
Calendar
Counties
Davidson County
Davie County
Education
Education Boards
Elementary Education
Iredell County
Kindergarten
Lexington
Local
Local Government
Mooresville
Municipalities
Secondary Education
Statesville
Thomasville
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115C | 174.12 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 84.2 | (n/a) | Citation Text |