NC H918 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-07 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-07 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expedite Permanency/DHHS Report SNAP/TANF
Title
Expedite Permanency/DHHS Report SNAP/TANF
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-25 - House - M4 Previous Question (Y: 57 N: 52 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2020-06-25 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 59 N: 53 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 30 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 25 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 62 N: 54 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 59 N: 53 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 30 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 25 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 62 N: 54 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-07 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2020-07-07 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2020-07-02 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/08/2020 |
2020-07-02 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 44.2 |
2020-07-02 | House | Received from the Governor |
2020-07-02 | Vetoed 07/02/2020 | |
2020-06-25 | Pres. To Gov. 6/25/2020 | |
2020-06-25 | Ratified | |
2020-06-25 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-06-25 | House | Concurred In S Com Sub |
2020-06-24 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/25/2020 |
2020-06-24 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2020-06-24 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Engrossed |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/24/2020 |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/23/2020 |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/22/2020 |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-10-24 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-10-24 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2019-10-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-08-21 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary |
2019-08-21 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2019-08-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-08-20 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-08-20 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2019-05-06 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2019-05-06 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-05-06 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-05-03 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/06/2019 |
2019-05-03 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-05-03 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-05-02 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-02 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-22 | House | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-22 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-16 | House | Filed |