NC H912 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-30 - Ch. SL 2015-262
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-30 - Ch. SL 2015-262
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Taxation of Tribal Land and Tobacco Products
Title
Taxation of Tribal Land and Tobacco Products
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-24 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 84 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2015-09-24 - House - M6 Reconsider M11 Not Concur (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2015-09-23 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 102 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-09-23 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 102 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-09-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-09-22 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-07-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-09-24 - House - M6 Reconsider M11 Not Concur (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2015-09-23 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 102 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-09-23 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 102 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-09-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-09-22 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-07-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-30 | Ch. SL 2015-262 | |
2015-09-30 | Signed by Gov. 9/30/2015 | |
2015-09-29 | Pres. To Gov. 9/29/2015 | |
2015-09-28 | Ratified | |
2015-09-24 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-09-24 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2015-09-24 | House | Reconsidered Concurrence |
2015-09-24 | House | Conf Com Dismissed |
2015-09-23 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2015-09-23 | House | Failed Concur In S Com Sub |
2015-09-22 | House | Placed On Cal For 09/23/2015 |
2015-09-22 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2015-09-22 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2015-09-22 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2015-09-22 | Engrossed | |
2015-09-22 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-09-22 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-09-22 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-09-21 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-09-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-07-22 | Senate | Ref To Com On Finance |
2015-07-22 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-07-22 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2015-07-21 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2015-07-21 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-07-21 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-07-20 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/21/2015 |
2015-07-20 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-07-16 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/28/2015 |
2015-07-16 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-07-16 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-20 | House | Ref To Com On Finance |
2015-04-20 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-16 | House | Filed |