NC H911 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 11 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Regulatory Reform 2.0

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulatory Reform 2.0

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-08-11 - House - Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-08-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 63 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-16SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-08-16SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-08-16SenateRegular Message Received From House
2021-08-12HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-08-11HouseOrdered Engrossed
2021-08-11HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-08-11HouseAmend Failed A6
2021-08-11HouseAmend Adopted A5
2021-08-11HouseAmend Adopted A4
2021-08-10HousePlaced On Cal For 08/11/2021
2021-08-10HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2021-08-05HousePlaced On Cal For 08/10/2021
2021-08-05HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-08-05HouseAmend Adopted A3
2021-08-05HouseAmend Adopted A2
2021-08-05HouseAmend Adopted A1
2021-08-05HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-08-05HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-08-05HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2021-06-24HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-06-24HouseReptd Fav
2021-06-10HouseRe-ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-06-10HouseSerial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken
2021-06-10HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-05-11HouseRef to the Com on Regulatory Reform, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-05-11HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-05-10HouseFiled

Subjects

Administrative Code
Administrative Rules
Alarm Systems
Auditing & Audits
Boards
Budget & Management Office
Building Code Council
Building Codes
Charter Schools
Columbus County
Commissions
Committees
Confidentiality
Contracts
Council Of State
Councils
Counties
Data & Records Systems
Definitions
Deq
Deregulation
Dhhs
Education
Electricity Generation & Distribution
Elementary Education
Employment
Environment
Environmental Health
Environmental Management Comn.
Fees
General Assembly
Geographic Information Council
Geography
Government Employees
Governmental Operations Comn.
Hazardous Substances
Health Services
Housing
Information Technology
Information Technology Dept.
Infrastructure
Landlord & Tenant
Licenses & Permits
Licensing & Certification
Local Government
Massage Therapy
Massage Therapy Board
Municipalities
Occupations
Opticians & Optometrists
Opticians Board
Planning & Zoning
Pollution
Privacy
Property
Public
Public Health
Public Health Comn.
Public Officials
Public Records
Railroads
Real Estate
Records
Rentals & Leasing
Reports
Safety
Safety Equipment
Sanitary Districts
Secondary Education
Session Laws
State Auditor
State Board Of
State Employees
Studies
Tabor City
Tax Districts
Taxation
Taxes
Teachers
Transportation
Transportation Dept.
Utilities
Veterinarians
Veterinary Board
Veterinary Medicine
Water & Sewer Systems

Code Citations


North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/H911
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H911v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H911v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H911v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H911v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H911v4.pdf
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52101/0/H911-PCS40638-BHxf-16
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52601/0/H911-PCS40653-BRxf-21
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52605/0/H911-ABR-50-V-3
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52610/0/H911-ABR-51-V-1
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52604/0/H911-ARI-36-V-4
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52660/0/H911-ABR-52-V-2
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52661/0/H911-ABR-53-V-2
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52662/0/H911-ABR-54-V-1
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H911-SMCC-12(CSBHxf-16)-v-16
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H911-SMSV-70(e2)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H911-SMBR-62(CSBRxf-21)-v-4
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/453
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/459

Bill Comments 750

feedback