NC H91 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-14 - Ch. SL 2015-16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-14 - Ch. SL 2015-16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Study Misuse of Handicapped Parking Placards
Title
Study Misuse of Handicapped Parking Placards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - Third Reading (Y: 88 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 77 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - Third Reading (Y: 88 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 77 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-14 | Ch. SL 2015-16 | |
2015-05-14 | Signed by Gov. 5/14/2015 | |
2015-05-08 | Pres. To Gov. 5/8/2015 | |
2015-05-07 | Ratified | |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Transportation |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-23 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-22 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-22 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-22 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-04-22 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-22 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-02-18 | House | Ref To Com On Transportation |
2015-02-18 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-02-16 | House | Filed |