NC H909 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Ch. SL 2015-98
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Ch. SL 2015-98
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
ABC Omnibus Legislation
Title
ABC Omnibus Legislation
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Hager [R] | Rep. John Bell [R] | Rep. Brian Brown [R] | Rep. Elmer Floyd [D] |
Rep. Susan Hamilton [D] | Rep. Edward Hanes [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-04 - House - Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 32 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - M11 Concur Second Reading (Y: 72 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - Motion 12 - Add to Cal. (Y: 76 N: 37 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - Third Reading (Y: 105 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - M11 Concur Second Reading (Y: 72 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - Motion 12 - Add to Cal. (Y: 76 N: 37 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - Third Reading (Y: 105 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-19 | Ch. SL 2015-98 | |
2015-06-19 | Signed by Gov. 6/19/2015 | |
2015-06-09 | Pres. To Gov. 6/9/2015 | |
2015-06-08 | Ratified | |
2015-06-04 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-06-04 | House | Concurred On 3rd Reading |
2015-06-03 | House | Concurred On 2nd Reading |
2015-06-03 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-06-03 | House | Ruled Material |
2015-06-03 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-06-03 | House | Reptd Fav To Concur |
2015-06-02 | House | Re-ref Com On Alcoholic Beverage Control |
2015-06-02 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Re-ref to Commerce. If fav, re-ref to Finance |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2015-04-30 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-29 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-29 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-04-29 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-29 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-21 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2015-04-21 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-04-20 | House | Ref to the Com on Alcoholic Beverage Control, if favorable, Finance |
2015-04-20 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-15 | House | Filed |