NC H908 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-541
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-541
Summary
Election Administration Amendments.
Title
Election Administration Amendments.
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Fisher [D] | Rep. Richard Glazier [D] | Rep. Melanie Goodwin [D] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] |
Rep. Verla Insko [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-28 | Ch. SL 2009-541 | |
2009-08-28 | Signed By Gov. 8/28/2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Pres. To Gov. 8/11/2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Ratified | |
2009-08-10 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2009-08-07 | Placed On Cal For 8/10/2009 | |
2009-08-07 | Conf Com Reported | |
2009-08-07 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2009-08-07 | Placed On Cal For 8/7/2009 | |
2009-08-07 | Conf Com Reported | |
2009-08-07 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2009-08-06 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2009-08-06 | Failed concur in S/Com Sub | |
2009-08-06 | Placed On Cal For 8/6/2009 | |
2009-08-06 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-08-06 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2009-08-06 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-05 | Placed On Cal For 8/6/2009 | |
2009-08-05 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-08-04 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-08-04 | Amend Adopted #2 | |
2009-08-03 | Placed On Cal For 8/4/2009 | |
2009-08-03 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-07-30 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-07-30 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-05 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-05-05 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-04 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-04 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2009-04-30 | Placed On Cal For 5/4/2009 | |
2009-04-30 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-04-30 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-09 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-04-09 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-01 | Ref to the Com on Election Law and Campaign Finance Reform, if favorable, Judiciary I | |
2009-04-01 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-31 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H908 |