NC H884 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-06 - Ch. SL 2014-104
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-06 - Ch. SL 2014-104
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Dropout Prev./Recovery Pilot Charter School
Title
Dropout Prev./Recovery Pilot Charter School
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-07-31 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-07-30 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-07-30 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 30 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-07-30 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - House - A1 Hamilton Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-07-30 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-07-30 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 30 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-07-30 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - House - A1 Hamilton Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-06 | Ch. SL 2014-104 | |
2014-08-06 | Signed by Gov. 8/6/2014 | |
2014-07-31 | Pres. To Gov. 7/31/2014 | |
2014-07-31 | Ratified | |
2014-07-31 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-07-31 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2014-07-31 | House | Added to Calendar |
2014-07-31 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2014-07-30 | Engrossed | |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Amend Failed A2 |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Amend Adopted A3 |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Placed on Today's Supplemental Calendar |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2014-07-29 | Senate | Sequential Referral To Appropriations/Base Budget Added |
2014-07-29 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2014-07-29 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-05-14 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2013-05-14 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-14 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-14 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2013-05-14 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/14/2013 |
2013-05-14 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-05-14 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-05-13 | House | Serial Referral To Appropriations Stricken |
2013-04-15 | House | Ref to the Com on Education, if favorable, Appropriations |
2013-04-15 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-11 | House | Filed |