NC H882 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-15 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-15 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Register/Title Off-Road ATVs & Motorcycles
Title
Register/Title Off-Road ATVs & Motorcycles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-15 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2011-06-15 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-06-06 | Serial Referral to Agriculture is Stricken | |
2011-05-04 | Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Agriculture, if favorable, Finance | |
2011-05-04 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-05-03 | Filed |