NC H870 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Ch. SL 2016-59
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Ch. SL 2016-59
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Cert. of Title/Manuf. Home Changes
Title
Cert. of Title/Manuf. Home Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-20 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | Ch. SL 2016-59 | |
2016-06-30 | Signed by Gov. 6/30/2016 | |
2016-06-21 | Pres. To Gov. 6/21/2016 | |
2016-06-21 | Ratified | |
2016-06-20 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-06-20 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2016-06-16 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/20/2016 |
2016-06-16 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2016-06-15 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2016-06-14 | Engrossed | |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-28 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-27 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-27 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-27 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-04-27 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-27 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-15 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary II |
2015-04-15 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-14 | House | Filed |