NC H857 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-18 - Failed 2nd Reading
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-18 - Failed 2nd Reading
Summary
Ballistics Standards/Taking Big Game.
Title
Ballistics Standards/Taking Big Game.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-18 | Failed 2nd Reading | |
2009-06-17 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-06-17 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-19 | Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources | |
2009-05-14 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-14 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-14 | Placed On Cal For 5/14/2009 | |
2009-05-14 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-14 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-08 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary III | |
2009-04-08 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-30 | Ref to the Com on Wildlife Resources, if favorable, Judiciary III | |
2009-03-30 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-26 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H857 |