NC H852 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-19)
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-29 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-29 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
The Rep. Becky Carney Cardiac Arrest Act
Title
The Rep. Becky Carney Cardiac Arrest Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-29 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-06-29 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-06-29 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2023-06-29 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2023-06-28 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-06-28 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-06-27 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/28/2023 |
2023-06-27 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-06-27 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-06-22 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-06-22 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-06-20 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2023-06-20 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-06-19 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-06-19 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-06-19 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken |
2023-04-26 | House | Ref to the Com on Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-04-26 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-04-25 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115C | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
115C | 12 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 218.75 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 238.66 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 47 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
116 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
116 | 11 | (n/a) | Citation Text |