NC H84 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-27 - Ch. SL 2017-191
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-27 - Ch. SL 2017-191
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
DL/Deaf or Hard of Hearing Designation
Title
DL/Deaf or Hard of Hearing Designation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-27 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-27 | Ch. SL 2017-191 | |
2017-07-27 | Signed by Gov. 7/27/2017 | |
2017-06-28 | Pres. To Gov. 6/28/2017 | |
2017-06-28 | Ratified | |
2017-06-27 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-27 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2017-06-26 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/27/2017 |
2017-06-26 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-06-26 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-06-26 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2017-06-26 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Engrossed |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/22/2017 |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/21/2017 |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/19/2017 |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-06 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/06/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-05 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2017-03-21 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary III |
2017-03-21 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-02-13 | House | Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Judiciary III |
2017-02-13 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed |