NC H832 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Ch. SL 2013-246
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Ch. SL 2013-246
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Expand Pharmacists' Immunizing Authority
Title
Expand Pharmacists' Immunizing Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-26 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - House - A1 Avila Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - House - A1 Avila Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-03 | Ch. SL 2013-246 | |
2013-07-03 | Signed by Gov. 7/3/2013 | |
2013-06-28 | Pres. To Gov. 6/28/2013 | |
2013-06-27 | Ratified | |
2013-06-26 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-06-26 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2013-06-25 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/26/2013 |
2013-06-25 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2013-06-24 | House | Rec To Concur S Com Sub |
2013-06-24 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Ref To Com On Health Care |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-05-13 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2013-05-13 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-13 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-13 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2013-05-09 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/13/2013 |
2013-05-09 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-05-09 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-05-09 | House | Serial Referral To Commerce and Job Development Stricken |
2013-04-11 | House | Ref to the Com on Health and Human Services, if favorable, Commerce and Job Development |
2013-04-11 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S500 (Same As) 2013-03-28 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate