NC H830 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Ch. SL 2013-189
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Ch. SL 2013-189
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Adopt State Symbols
Title
Adopt State Symbols
Sponsors
Rep. Marilyn Avila [R] | Rep. Susan Martin [R] | Rep. Patricia McElraft [R] | Rep. Roger West [R] |
Rep. Jonathan Jordan [R] | Rep. Nathan Ramsey [R] | Rep. Rena Turner [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-19 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-26 | Ch. SL 2013-189 | |
2013-06-26 | Signed by Gov. 6/26/2013 | |
2013-06-20 | Pres. To Gov. 6/20/2013 | |
2013-06-20 | Ratified | |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Health Care |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-05-06 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-06 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-02 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/06/2013 |
2013-05-01 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-05-01 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-04-24 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2013-04-24 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-04-24 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-04-24 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-04-11 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2013-04-11 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-10 | House | Filed |