NC H829 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Customary and Reasonable Fees for Appraisers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Customary and Reasonable Fees for Appraisers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-27SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-04-27SenatePassed 1st Reading
2017-04-27SenateRegular Message Received From House
2017-04-27HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2017-04-26HousePassed 3rd Reading
2017-04-26HousePassed 2nd Reading
2017-04-25HousePlaced On Cal For 04/26/2017
2017-04-25HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2017-04-25HouseReptd Fav
2017-04-25HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2017-04-25HouseWithdrawn From Com
2017-04-13HouseRef To Com On Commerce and Job Development
2017-04-13HousePassed 1st Reading
2017-04-11HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S571 (Same As) 2017-04-03 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback