NC H829 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-02 - Re-ref Com On Education/Higher Education
Pending: Senate Education/Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-02 - Re-ref Com On Education/Higher Education
Pending: Senate Education/Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Streamline Education Planning Responsibility
Title
Streamline Education Planning Responsibility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-02 | Re-ref Com On Education/Higher Education | |
2011-05-02 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-29 | Rec From House | |
2011-04-28 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-26 | Placed On Cal For 4/28/2011 | |
2011-04-20 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-04-20 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-04-07 | Ref To Com On Education | |
2011-04-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-06 | Filed |