NC H829 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-10 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Status: Introduced on March 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-10 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Summary
Development Tier Exception Modification.
Title
Development Tier Exception Modification.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-10 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-08-10 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-08-05 | Postponed To 8/10/2009 | |
2009-08-04 | Placed On Cal For 8/5/2009 | |
2009-08-04 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-08-04 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-11 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-05-11 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-30 | Ref to the Com on Commerce, Small Business, and Entrepreneurship, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-03-30 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-26 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S898 (Same As) 2009-08-26 - Ch. SL 2009-524
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H829 |