NC H825 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Charter School Advisory Bd. Member Changes
Title
Charter School Advisory Bd. Member Changes
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Saine [R] | Rep. Erin Pare [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-05-12 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-11 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-11 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-11 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-11 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-05 | House | Ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Appointments
Boards
Charter Schools
Charter Schools Advisory Board
Council Of State
Education
Education Cabinet
Membership
Public
Public Instruction
Public Instruction Dept.
Public Officials
State Board Of
Supt. Of
Term Lengths & Limits
Boards
Charter Schools
Charter Schools Advisory Board
Council Of State
Education
Education Cabinet
Membership
Public
Public Instruction
Public Instruction Dept.
Public Officials
State Board Of
Supt. Of
Term Lengths & Limits
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115C | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
115C | 218 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
120 | 121 | (n/a) | Citation Text |