NC H820 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Construction Contract Changes
Title
Construction Contract Changes
Sponsors
Rep. Dean Arp [R] | Rep. Sarah Stevens [R] | Rep. Mark Brody [R] | Rep. Matthew Winslow [R] |
Rep. Jerry Carter [R] | Rep. Karl Gillespie [R] | Sen. Timothy Moffitt [R] | Rep. Michael Wray [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 107 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-05-12 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-11 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-11 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2021-05-11 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-11 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-05-05 | House | Ref to the Com on Local Government - Land Use, Planning and Development, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Bridges
Construction
Contracts
Debtor & Creditor
Fines & Penalties
Infrastructure
Liens
Public
Surety & Fidelity
Transportation
Construction
Contracts
Debtor & Creditor
Fines & Penalties
Infrastructure
Liens
Public
Surety & Fidelity
Transportation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
143 | 128.1A | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143 | 128.1B | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143 | 129 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
22B | 1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
22B | 5 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
44A | 35 | (n/a) | Citation Text |