NC H809 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - Ch. SL 2011-386
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - Ch. SL 2011-386
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Model Healthcare-Associated Infections Law
Title
Model Healthcare-Associated Infections Law
Sponsors
Rep. Justin Burr [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-17 - House - M11 Concur\Sen. Amd. 1 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-27 | Ch. SL 2011-386 | |
2011-06-27 | Signed By Gov. 6/27/2011 | |
2011-06-20 | Pres. To Gov. 6/20/2011 | |
2011-06-17 | Ratified | |
2011-06-17 | Concurred In S Amend 1 | |
2011-06-16 | Placed On Cal For 6/17/2011 | |
2011-06-16 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-16 | Rec To Concur In S Amend 1 | |
2011-06-16 | Ratification stricken (Res. 2011-8) | |
2011-06-16 | Recalled From Enrolling | |
2011-06-15 | Ratified | |
2011-06-14 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-14 | Placed On Cal For 6/14/2011 | |
2011-06-14 | Com Amend Adopted 1 | |
2011-06-14 | Reptd Fav As Amended | |
2011-06-08 | Ref To Com On Health Care | |
2011-06-08 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-06-08 | Rec From House | |
2011-06-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-07 | Placed On Cal For 6/7/2011 | |
2011-06-07 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-07 | Serial Referral to Finance Stricken | |
2011-06-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-04-07 | Ref to the Com on Health and Human Services, if favorable, Finance | |
2011-04-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-06 | Filed |