NC H799 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-08-19 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-08-19 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Zoning/Changes to Hist. Preserv. Procedures
Title
Zoning/Changes to Hist. Preserv. Procedures
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Brody [R] | Rep. John Ager [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-19 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2015-08-19 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-08-19 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-08-19 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2015-04-23 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II |
2015-04-23 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-15 | House | Ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Judiciary II |
2015-04-15 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-14 | House | Filed |