NC H776 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-4)
Status: Passed on July 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-08 - Ch. SL 2022-54
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-4)
Status: Passed on July 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-08 - Ch. SL 2022-54
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Remote Electronic Notarization
Title
Remote Electronic Notarization
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-07-01 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 104 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-09-23 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2021-09-22 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-09-22 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-09-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-09-23 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2021-09-22 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-09-22 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-09-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-08 | Ch. SL 2022-54 | |
2022-07-08 | Signed by Gov. 7/8/2022 | |
2022-07-01 | Pres. To Gov. 7/1/2022 | |
2022-07-01 | Ratified | |
2022-07-01 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2022-07-01 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2022-06-30 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/01/2022 |
2022-06-30 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 44(d) |
2022-06-30 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2021-09-23 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2021-09-23 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2021-09-23 | House | Failed Concur In S Com Sub |
2021-09-22 | House | Placed On Cal For 09/23/2021 |
2021-09-22 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2021-09-22 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2021-09-22 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2021-09-22 | Senate | Engrossed |
2021-09-22 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-09-22 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-09-22 | Senate | Amend Adopted A2 |
2021-09-22 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2021-09-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-09-20 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-09-20 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Commerce and Insurance |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-08-05 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-08-05 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-05-07 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-06 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-06 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-05 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/06/2021 |
2021-05-05 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-05 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-05 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-05 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-05-04 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary 1, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-04 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-03 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Administrative Code
Administrative Rules
Appropriations
Budgeting
Chaptered
Confidentiality
Council Of State
Criminal Records
Deeds
Electronic Government
Electronic Signatures
Emergency Services
Emerging Technologies
Government Employees
Id Systems
Information Technology
Internet
Notary Public
Oaths
Personnel
Presented
Privacy
Public
Public Officials
Public Records
Public Safety Dept.
Ratified
Recordation Of Instruments
Records
Register Of Deeds
Secretary Of State
State Employees
Telecommunications
Teleconferencing
Teleservices
Title Change
Administrative Rules
Appropriations
Budgeting
Chaptered
Confidentiality
Council Of State
Criminal Records
Deeds
Electronic Government
Electronic Signatures
Emergency Services
Emerging Technologies
Government Employees
Id Systems
Information Technology
Internet
Notary Public
Oaths
Personnel
Presented
Privacy
Public
Public Officials
Public Records
Public Safety Dept.
Ratified
Recordation Of Instruments
Records
Register Of Deeds
Secretary Of State
State Employees
Telecommunications
Teleconferencing
Teleservices
Title Change