NC H775 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on August 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-26 - Ch. SL 2009-514
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on August 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-26 - Ch. SL 2009-514
Summary
Alt. Testimony/Children and Adults with Disab.
Title
Alt. Testimony/Children and Adults with Disab.
Sponsors
Rep. Martha Alexander [D] | Rep. William Brisson [R] | Rep. Bob England [D] | Rep. Bill Faison [D] |
Rep. Mary Harrison [D] | Rep. Verla Insko [D] | Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] | Sen. Earline Parmon [D] |
Rep. Larry Womble [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-26 | Ch. SL 2009-514 | |
2009-08-26 | Signed By Gov. 8/26/2009 | |
2009-08-07 | Pres. To Gov. 8/7/2009 | |
2009-08-07 | Ratified | |
2009-08-06 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2009-08-05 | Placed On Cal For 8/6/2009 | |
2009-08-05 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-08-05 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-08-03 | Ref To Com On Judiciary III | |
2009-08-03 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2009-07-30 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-29 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-07-29 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-14 | Ref To Com On Judiciary II | |
2009-05-14 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-12 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-11 | Placed On Cal For 5/12/2009 | |
2009-05-11 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-11 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-14 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary III | |
2009-04-14 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-25 | Ref to the Com on Juvenile Justice, if favorable, Judiciary III | |
2009-03-25 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-24 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S241 (Same As) 2011-06-27 - Ch. SL 2011-329
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H775 |