NC H764 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-7)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-18 - Assigned To Commerce and Job Development Subcommittee on Alcoholic Beverage Control
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-18 - Assigned To Commerce and Job Development Subcommittee on Alcoholic Beverage Control
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Beer Franchise Law Clarifications
Title
Beer Franchise Law Clarifications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-18 | Assigned To Commerce and Job Development Subcommittee on Alcoholic Beverage Control | |
2011-04-07 | Ref to the Com on Commerce and Job Development, if favorable, Finance | |
2011-04-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-06 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S745 (Same As) 2012-06-04 - Ch. SL 2012-4