NC H763 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-22 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-22 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Military Operations Protection Act of 2016
Title
Military Operations Protection Act of 2016
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Millis [R] | Rep. John Bell [R] | Rep. Dennis Riddell [R] | Rep. James Adams [R] |
Rep. Susan Martin [R] | Rep. James Whitmire [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-20 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Senate - Amendment 10 (Y: 18 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-06-20 - Senate - Amendment 9 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Senate - Amendment 8 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Senate - Amendment 7 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Senate - Amendment 6 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Senate - Amendment 5 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Senate - Amendment 4 (Y: 20 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-06-20 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 41 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - A1 Harrison Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Senate - Amendment 10 (Y: 18 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-06-20 - Senate - Amendment 9 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Senate - Amendment 8 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Senate - Amendment 7 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Senate - Amendment 6 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Senate - Amendment 5 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Senate - Amendment 4 (Y: 20 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-06-20 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 41 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - A1 Harrison Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-22 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2016-06-21 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2016-06-20 | Engrossed | |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Amend Failed A10 |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Amend Adopted A9 |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Amend Adopted A8 |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Amend Adopted A7 |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Amend Adopted A6 |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Amend Adopted A5 |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Amend Failed A4 |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Amend Adopted A3 |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Amend Adopted A2 |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/20/2016 |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-29 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-28 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2015-04-28 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-28 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-28 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-04-28 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-04-28 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-28 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-04-15 | House | Ref To Com On Regulatory Reform |
2015-04-15 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-14 | House | Filed |