NC H756 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-29 - Ref To Com On Judiciary I
Pending: Senate Judiciary I Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-29 - Ref To Com On Judiciary I
Pending: Senate Judiciary I Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Reform Recreational Use Statute
Title
Reform Recreational Use Statute
Sponsors
Rep. Charles McGrady [R] | Rep. James Whitmire [R] | Rep. John Faircloth [R] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] |
Rep. Becky Carney [D] | Rep. Susan Fisher [D] | Rep. Elmer Floyd [D] | Rep. Richard Glazier [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-29 | Senate | Ref To Com On Judiciary I |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-04-25 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-04-25 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-04-24 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/25/2013 |
2013-04-24 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-04-24 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-04-11 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee B |
2013-04-11 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-10 | House | Filed |