NC H755 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-26 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-26 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Bankruptcy Amendments
Title
Bankruptcy Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. John Blust [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-26 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-25 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-25 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-25 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-04-25 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-25 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-04-19 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II |
2017-04-19 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-19 | House | Serial Referral To Banking Stricken |
2017-04-13 | House | Ref to the Com on State and Local Government II, if favorable, Banking |
2017-04-13 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-11 | House | Filed |