NC H74 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-23 - Ch. SL 2013-413
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-23 - Ch. SL 2013-413
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Regulatory Reform Act of 2013
Title
Regulatory Reform Act of 2013
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-07-26 - House - R3 Ruled Mat'l C RPT Adoption (Y: 63 N: 34 NV: 7 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2013-07-26 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-07-25 - House - R2 Ruled Mat'l C RPT Adoption (Y: 78 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-07-25 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-07-22 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-07-19 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 90 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-07-26 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-07-25 - House - R2 Ruled Mat'l C RPT Adoption (Y: 78 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-07-25 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-07-22 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-07-19 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 90 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-23 | Ch. SL 2013-413 | |
2013-08-23 | Signed by Gov. 8/23/2013 | |
2013-07-26 | Pres. To Gov. 7/26/2013 | |
2013-07-26 | Ratified | |
2013-07-26 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-07-26 | House | Conf Report Adopted 3rd |
2013-07-26 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted 3rd |
2013-07-25 | House | Conf Report Adopted 2nd |
2013-07-25 | House | Added to Calendar |
2013-07-25 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-07-25 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2013-07-25 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-07-25 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted 2nd |
2013-07-24 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/25/2013 |
2013-07-24 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/25/2013 |
2013-07-24 | House | Ruled Material |
2013-07-24 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2013-07-24 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2013-07-22 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2013-07-22 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2013-07-22 | House | Failed Concur In S Com Sub |
2013-07-21 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/22/2013 |
2013-07-21 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2013-07-19 | House | Rec To Concur S Com Sub |
2013-07-19 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-07-19 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-07-18 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2013-07-18 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-05-13 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-13 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-09 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/13/2013 |
2013-05-09 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-05-09 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-02-07 | House | Ref To Com On Regulatory Reform |
2013-02-07 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-02-05 | House | Filed |