NC H732 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-26 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Status: Introduced on March 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-26 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Summary
Dispute Resolution Fees.
Title
Dispute Resolution Fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-26 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-05-26 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-23 | Ref to the Com on Judiciary I, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-03-23 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-19 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S707 (Same As) 2012-07-12 - Ch. SL 2012-149
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H732 |